RI S0994 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows locally administered retirement plans in the city of Central Falls to allow employees or retired who are members of the FOP Lodge, 2 to join the Municipal Employees Retirement System (MERS) by providing greater flexibility in funding policies.
Title
Retirement Of Municipal Employees And Closed Municipal Retirement Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (09/14/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Committee heard |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0994.pdf |