RI S0979 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/26/2019)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/26/2019)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Newport to impose a surcharge on the price of admission to organizations or venues that sell more than twenty thousand (20,000) tickets during the time period commencing on July 1, 2018 until June 30, 2019.
Title
Newport Admission Fee Surcharge
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0979.pdf |