RI S0958 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Frank S. Lombardi to join Nicolas DePaola and Vanessa DiPaolo in marriage on or about August 8, 2015, within the Town of Narragansett, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2015-06-16 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2015) |
2015-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2015) |
2015-06-11 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/11/2015) |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2015) |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |