RI S0952 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the "Green Buildings Act" to include public projects and updates the standards to include LEED for Neighborhood Development, and SITES.
Title
The Green Buildings Act
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (09/14/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |