RI S0947 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the fines for motor vehicles operators who block the box at traffic signal controlled intersections and would authorize the state traffic commission to allow for the painting of a four (4) sided box at dangerous intersections.
Title
Intersection Violations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2015) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0947.pdf |