RI S0946 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the town of Lincoln to issue $60,000,000 in bonds for school construction and renovation, subject to voter approval.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Lincoln To Issue Bonds And Notes In An Amount Not Exceeding $60,000,000 To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Rehabilitation, Repair, Improvements, Furnishing And Equipping Of And/or Additions To Lincoln High School And School Facilities In The Town
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-26 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |