RI S0915 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the conditions of bail and recognizance to permit the release of a person charged with a misdemeanor without financial conditions and prohibits the use of a fixed bail schedule.
Title
Bail And Recognizance
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2023) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0915.pdf |