RI S0913 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Decriminalizes certain commercial sexual activity to a civil violation punishable with a fine and repeal the authority to detain a defendant unless they test positive for venereal disease in an infectious stage.
Title
Commercial Sexual Activity
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2023) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0913.pdf |