RI S0913 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of farmer brewery and farmer distillery licenses to qualifying farms subject to conditions and regulations issued by the department of regulation.
Title
General Provisions - Manufacturing And Wholesale Licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0913.pdf |