RI S0889 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires retail establishments to accept cash in payment for goods and services excluding online purchases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Regulatory Provisions - Deceptive Trade Practices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2019)
2019-06-18HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-14HouseScheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-06-12HouseReferred to House Corporations
2019-06-11SenateSenate read and passed
2019-06-05SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019)
2019-06-04SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-31SenateScheduled for consideration (06/04/2019)
2019-05-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-24SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019)
2019-05-22SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback