RI S0889 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - Teachers' Tenure (would Provide Teachers Who Have Attained Tenure Status A Leave Of Absence To Accept An Administrative Position Without Losing Tenure Status. This Leave Of Absence Shall Not Exceed Three (3) Years.)
Title
An Act Relating To Education - Teachers' Tenure (would Provide Teachers Who Have Attained Tenure Status A Leave Of Absence To Accept An Administrative Position Without Losing Tenure Status. This Leave Of Absence Shall Not Exceed Three (3) Years.)
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/26/2013) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2013) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |