RI S0872 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the lieutenant governor serve as the chairperson of the long-term care coordinating council and provides that a quorum of the council consist of twelve (12) members of the council.
Title
Long-term Care Coordinating Council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/20/2023) |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0872.pdf |