RI S0864 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses - Weapons (would Make A Number Of Changes To The Statutes Relating To The Sale And Possession Of Weapons And To The Penalties For Violating The Same.)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses - Weapons (would Make A Number Of Changes To The Statutes Relating To The Sale And Possession Of Weapons And To The Penalties For Violating The Same.)
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0864.pdf |