RI S0863 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the word “war” from the sentence “honorable discharged war veteran.”
Title
Rhode Island Veterans' Home
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-08 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-05-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/11/2021) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2021) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |