RI S0850 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the owner of a vehicle be notified in writing or by electronic mail that installation of an aftermarket glass may require re-calibration of safety related systems, or vehicle may not function as designed.
Title
Motor Vehicle Replacement Parts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |