RI S0839 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the language on the 9/11 Memorial in the State House to include all Rhode Islanders.
Title
Relating To The 9/11 Memorial
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |