RI S0838 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Proposed Substitute
Hearing: Jun 25 Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides a special motor vehicle registration plate honoring the New York Yankees for their twenty-seven (27) World Championships and the New York Yankees Universe Fund for the benefit of Rhode Island based charitable organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-21SenateScheduled for consideration (06/25/2019)
2019-05-15SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-10SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019)
2019-04-30SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback