RI S0836 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Rhode Island Nonprofit Corporation Act regarding consolidation and merger.
Title
Merger And Consolidation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2021) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |