RI S0834 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all state departments cooperate with judicial nominating commission, provide any information that might assist in judicial selection. Requires DOA provide secure office space on state property. Requires written minutes of all commission meetings
Title
Courts - Judicial Selection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |