RI S0816 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits affordable housing programs with requirements that exceed those set forth in the general laws of the state from being included in the statewide planning program.
Title
State Guide Plan
Sponsors
Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2015) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/29/2015) |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0816.pdf |