RI S0810 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends provisions relative to benefit corporations issuance of annual reports, and the recording of the first such annual report.
Title
Relating To Corporations, Associations, And Partnerships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-10 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2015) |
2015-05-26 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/26/2015) |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/13/2015) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/05/2015) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2015) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |