RI S0808 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Incorporation Of Congregation Jeshuat Israel In The City Of Newport
Title
An Act Relating To The Incorporation Of Congregation Jeshuat Israel In The City Of Newport
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-28 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-22 | Senate | Referred to House Corporations |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2013) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2013) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0808.pdf |