RI S0797 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the permissible funeral expense for a veteran who dies at the veterans' home from $5,000 to $10,000.
Title
Rhode Island Veterans' Home
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2015-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/16/2015) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/14/2015) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2015) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |