RI S0794 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the department of transportation to impose a weight restriction or close any state, local or privately-owned bridge, in the interest of public safety.
Title
Size, Weight, And Load Limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-25 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to House State Government & Elections |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |