RI S0787 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Validates and ratifies amendments to the Home Rule Charter of the town of Tiverton, which amendments were adopted and approved by the electors of the town of Tiverton on November 4, 2014.
Title
Validating And Ratifying An Amendment To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of Tiverton
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-05-07 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2015) |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/28/2015) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2015) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |