RI S0776 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits commercial motor trucks, with a gross weight rating of twenty-six thousand one pounds (26,001 lbs.) or more, from traveling on Limerock Road, in Smithfield and Lincoln.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Size, Weight And Load Limits--smithfield And Lincoln

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Senate - Size, weight and load limits approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2019-06-25SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2019-06-20SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019)
2019-06-20SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-19SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-14SenateScheduled for consideration (06/20/2019)
2019-04-25SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2019)
2019-04-04SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback