RI S0774 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019)
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Jun 25 Senate Health and Human Services Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Includes in the practice of physical therapy ordering diagnostic images and studies provided they are performed and interpreted by other licensed health care professionals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical Therapists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateScheduled for consideration (06/25/2019)
2019-05-07SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-03SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019)
2019-04-04SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback