RI S0767 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the EOHHS to use appropriated funds to support graduate medical education programs and research and directs the secretary of EOHHS to determine the appropriate Medicaid payment mechanism in order to make the payments annually.
Title
Graduate Medical Education
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2021) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0767.pdf |