RI S0763 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pension benefits that originate from and were taxed in another state are exempted from Rhode Island state taxation.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0763.pdf |