RI S0762 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the local share of education funding to be paid to charter public schools based on a comparison of performance data between the specific school from which the student is coming and the specific charter school that will be receiving the student.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2023) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0762.pdf |