RI S0758 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance: would provide the authority necessary to bring Rhode Island into compliance with the Nonadmitted and Reinsurance Reform Act of 2010 ("NRRA") enacted as part of the Dodd/Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act of 2010
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-05-24 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-11 | Referred to House Corporations | |
2011-05-10 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-05-03 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-04-28 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-04-28 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-04-05 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-24 | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0758.pdf |