RI S0750 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Urging All Rhode Island Financial Institutions To Voluntarily Reduce The Interest Rate Cap For Scra-qualified Members Serving In The Military
Title
Senate Resolution Urging All Rhode Island Financial Institutions To Voluntarily Reduce The Interest Rate Cap For Scra-qualified Members Serving In The Military
Sponsors
Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-04-12 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-23 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0750.pdf |