RI S0740 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Entitles correctional officers with twenty-five (25) years of service and who are at least fifty-five (55) years of age to receive a non-Medicare-eligible retiree health care insurance benefit.
Title
Insurance Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2019) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |