RI S0737 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "student loan bill of rights act" which establishes guidelines for the issuance of postsecondary loans.
Title
Student Loan Bill Of Rights Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee heard |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (05/14/2019) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Finance |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |