RI S0726 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Comprehensively amends the state's apprenticeship laws to make them easier to understand and be more consistent with each other and applicable federal regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Apprenticeships

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseReferred to House Corporations
2019-05-14SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/14/2019)
2019-05-08SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-05-02SenateScheduled for consideration (05/08/2019)
2019-05-01SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2019-05-01SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2019-04-30SenateProposed Substitute
2019-04-26SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019)
2019-04-03SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-29SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019)
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback