RI S0721 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-24 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-24 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides protections against wage differentials based solely on sex.
Title
Fair Employment Practices
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Fair employment practices approval of amendment lc 000109/2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2015) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2015) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |