RI S0720 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the directors of the departments of environmental management and health to enforce the Federal Food Safety Modernization Act as it pertains to commercial growers of fruits and vegetables.
Title
Agricultural Functions Of The Department Of Environmental Management
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Agricultural functions of dept. of environ. management (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Agricultural functions of dept. of environ. management (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |