RI S0709 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance (would Enact The National Association Of Insurance Commissioners Risk Management And Own Risk And Solvency Assessment Model Act)
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance (would Enact The National Association Of Insurance Commissioners Risk Management And Own Risk And Solvency Assessment Model Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (05/28/2013) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2013) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to House Corporations |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2013) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2013) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0709.pdf |