RI S0706 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that occupants of state-owned group homes be given the right of first refusal to purchase the property subject to their lease.
Title
Management And Disposal Of Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2023) |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/20/2023) |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0706.pdf |