RI S0686 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - The Rhode Island Economic Development Corporation
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - The Rhode Island Economic Development Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred to House Finance |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/11/2013) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2013) |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Commerce |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0686.pdf |