RI S0684 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Penalty of $10,000 for violating Deceptive Trade Practices Act.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions -- Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-23 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |