RI S0681 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Rubalcook, Inc.
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Rubalcook, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-09 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2017) |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2017) |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/30/2017) |