RI S0680 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals
Title
An Act Relating To Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | House | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | House passed Sub A |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (07/03/2013) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Referred to House Finance |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2013) |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2013) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2013) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |