RI S0678 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands TDI benefits, changes the calculation of the taxable wage base, includes state and municipal employees; increases the maximum number of weeks an employee can collect TDI and TCI; and expands TCI benefits for the care of siblings and grandchildren.
Title
Temporary Disability Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0678.pdf |