RI S0677 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vests the traffic tribunal with jurisdiction over the adjudication of alleged violations of the harassment of hunters, trappers and fishers law.
Title
Traffic Tribunal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2021) |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2021) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/13/2021) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |