RI S0676 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the provisions requiring the reporting of immunization status and any other relevant information to adults, not just children, and requires the department of health to include routine adult immunization in the department’s immunization program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department Of Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateSigned by Governor
2019-07-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-27HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-26HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/27/2019)
2019-06-24HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-24HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2019)
2019-06-24HousePlaced on House Calendar
2019-06-21HouseScheduled for consideration (06/24/2019)
2019-06-21HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2019-06-20SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/20/2019)
2019-06-18SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-17SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-14SenateScheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-06-13SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-06-12SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/13/2019)
2019-05-09SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-03SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2019)
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback