RI S0675 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that financial security is required for any motor vehicle registered or required to be registered in the state of Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Reparations Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01SenateSigned by Governor
2021-06-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-06-23HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2021-06-18HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/23/2021)
2021-06-15HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2021-06-11HouseScheduled for consideration (06/15/2021)
2021-05-19HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2021-05-18SenateSenate read and passed
2021-05-14SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/18/2021)
2021-05-13SenateCommittee recommends passage
2021-05-07SenateScheduled for consideration (05/13/2021)
2021-04-08SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021)
2021-03-18SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback