RI S0672 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an action authorizing any person who has been sentenced to imprisonment greater than one year subsequent to being wrongfully convicted of a criminal offense to petition court for an award of compensation and damages, including attorney’s fees.
Title
Relating To Criminal Procedure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |