RI S0665 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Public Funded Election System In The State Of Rhode Island
Title
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Public Funded Election System In The State Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-28 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013) |
2013-06-22 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/07/2013) |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0665.pdf |