RI S0663 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes and implements woodland stewardship and preservation programs managed by the department of environmental management administered by cities and towns through local comprehensive planning and zoning.
Title
Woodland Preservation And Stewardship Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0663.pdf |